skip to content

Felemegos, Ioannis

CPSO#: 94647

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 03 Mar 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 03 Mar 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Greek

Education:Windsor University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
PRESCOTT FAMILY ASSOCIATES
555 KING STREET WEST
Prescott ON  K0E 1T0
Phone: (613) 925-5977
Fax: (613) 925-1238 Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Ioannis Felemegos Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 13 2019

Shareholders:
Dr. I. Felemegos ( CPSO# 94647 )

Business Address:
555 King Street West
Prescott ON  K0E 1T0
Phone Number: (613) 925-5977


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - Vermont

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:16 Dec 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. IOANNIS FELEMEGOS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FELEMEGOS is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 07 Dec 2010
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 07 Dec 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 06 Dec 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 03 Mar 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Mar 2011