skip to content

Fejer, Imre Bela

CPSO#: 23005

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 23 Apr 1980
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 23 Apr 1980
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, German, Hungarian

Education:University of Toronto, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 100
4125 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1E 2S2
Phone: (416) 284-9111
Fax: (416) 284-5077 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. I Fejer Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 06 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. I. Fejer ( CPSO# 23005 )

Business Address:
Suite 100
4125 Lawrence Avenue East
Toronto ON  M1E 2S2

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jul 1970
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 23 Apr 1980
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 23 Apr 1980

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 23 Apr 1980 Active
             Dr. Imre B. Fejer may not purchase or possess injectable narcotic drugs,
            effective April 23, 1980.