skip to content

Feigelson, Lori

CPSO#: 87340

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 03 Jul 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Université de Montréal Faculté de Médeci, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Glengrove Medical Centre
2760 Yonge Street
North York ON  M4N 2J2
Phone: (416) 481-1173
Fax: (416) 481-7431 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

1013 Wilson Ave
suite 101
North York ON  M3K 1G1
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Lori Feigelson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 23 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Feigelson ( CPSO# 87340 )

Business Address:
Glengrove Medical Centre
2760 Yonge Street
North York ON  M4N 2J2
Phone Number: (416) 481-1173

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Toronto Rehabilitation Institute Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective:30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. LORI FEIGELSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FEIGELSON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2012