skip to content

Feher, Eszter Virag

CPSO#: 92088

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 13 Sep 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 20 Oct 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Medical University of Semmelweis, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 10 Sep 2009 to 19 Oct 2009
PEAP - CF - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 20 Oct 2009 to 13 Sep 2010
CF - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 14 Sep 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Oct 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Sep 2010