skip to content

Fedoruk, James Curtis

CPSO#: 30932

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 10 Jul 1979
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 05 Mar 2020
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 130
11811 Tecumseh Road East
Tecumseh ON  N8N 4M7
Phone: (519) 956-9172
Fax: (519) 956-9446 Electoral District: 01

Additional Practice Location(s)

Koonar Physiotyherapy
Suite 200
2525 Roseville Garden Dr
Windsor ON  N8N 4M7
Canada
Phone: 519 974-9997
Fax: 519 974-9996
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: J. C. Fedoruk Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 12 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Fedoruk ( CPSO# 30932 )

Business Address:
2525 Roseville Garden Drive
Suite 200
Windsor ON  N8T 3J8
Phone Number: (519) 979-9997

Business Address:
The Urgent Care Centre
11811 Tecumseh Road East
Suite 130
Windsor ON  N8N 4M7
Phone Number: (519) 956-9172

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective:01 Nov 1985 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 1979
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 02 Aug 2017
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 02 Aug 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Oct 2019
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 05 Mar 2020
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 05 Mar 2020

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
member Effective: 05 Mar 2020 Active
             As from March 5, 2020, the following are imposed as terms, conditions and
            limitations on the certificate of registration held by Dr. James Curtis Fedoruk
            in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Fedoruk to the
            College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario: 

                        UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT
                                          ("Undertaking") 
                  
                                                of
                  
                                    DR. JAMES CURTIS FEDORUK
                                          ("Dr. Fedoruk") 
                  
                                                to
                  
                        COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                          (the "College")
                  
                  
                  
            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code"  means  the  Health  Professions  Procedural  Code,  which  is
                  Schedule  2  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c.
                  18, as amended;
                  
                  "ICR Committee" means the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee of
                  the College;
                  
                  "NMS" means the Drug Program Services Branch, the Narcotics Monitoring
                  System implemented under the Narcotics Safety and Awareness Act, 2010;
                  
                  "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;
                  
                  "Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the
                  public.
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Fedoruk, certificate of registration number 30932, am a member of
                  the College.

            (3)   I, Dr. Fedoruk, acknowledge that the College conducted an investigation
                  bearing File Number 7216403 (the "Investigation") into whether I engaged
                  in professional misconduct or am incompetent in my family medicine and
                  chronic pain management practice, including my billing to OHIP.

            (4)   I, Dr. Fedoruk, acknowledge that, in addition to accepting this
                  Undertaking, the College will also deliver a caution in person.

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (5)   I, Dr. Fedoruk, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking,
                  effective immediately.




            (6)   Clinical Supervision

                  (a)   I, Dr. Fedoruk, undertake to practise under the guidance of a
                        clinical supervisor or clinical supervisors acceptable to the
                        College (the "Clinical Supervisor" or "Clinical Supervisors"), for
                        three (3) months ("Clinical Supervision").
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Fedoruk, acknowledge that I have reviewed the Clinical
                        Supervisor's undertaking, attached hereto as Appendix "A", and
                        understand what is required of the Clinical Supervisor. The
                        Clinical Supervisor will, at minimum:
                  
                        (i)   Facilitate the education program set out in the
                              Individualized Education Plan ("IEP"), attached hereto as
                              Appendix "B";
                  
                        (ii)  Review the materials provided by the College and have an
                              initial meeting to discuss the objectives for the Clinical
                              Supervision and practice improvement recommendations;
                  
                        (iii) Meet with me at my Practice Location, or another location
                              approved by the College, once every month;
                  
                        (iv)  Review at least twenty-five (25) of my patient charts at
                              every meeting, together with the related OHIP billing
                              information;
                  
                        (v)   Discuss any concerns arising from the chart and billing
                              reviews;
                  
                        (vi)  Make recommendations to me for practice improvements and
                              ongoing professional development and inquire into my
                              compliance with the recommendations;
                  
                        (vii) Perform any other duties, such as reviewing other documents
                              or conducting interviews with staff or colleagues, that the
                              Clinical Supervisor deems necessary to my Clinical
                              Supervision; and
                  
                        (viii)Submit written reports to the College once at the end of
                              Clinical Supervision, or more frequently if the Clinical
                              Supervisor has concerns about my standard of practice.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Fedoruk, acknowledge that the charts reviewed shall be
                        selected by the Clinical Supervisor based on the educational needs
                        identified in the IEP, attached hereto as Appendix "B", as well as
                        the areas of concern identified in the report of the assessor dated
                        December 16, 2019, and concerns that may arise during the period of
                        Clinical Supervision.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Fedoruk, undertake to cooperate fully with the Clinical
                        Supervision of my practice, conducted under the term of this
                        Undertaking and Appendix "A" to this Undertaking, and to abide by
                        the recommendations of my Clinical Supervisor, including but not
                        limited to, any recommended practice improvements and ongoing
                        professional development.




                  (e)   I, Dr. Fedoruk, undertake to ensure that Appendix "A" to this
                        Undertaking is signed and delivered to the College within thirty
                        (30) days of the date I execute this Undertaking.
                  
                  (f)   I, Dr. Fedoruk, undertake that if a person who has given an
                        undertaking in Appendix "A" to this Undertaking is unable or
                        unwilling to continue to fulfill its provisions, I shall, within
                        twenty (20) days of receiving notice of same, obtain an executed
                        undertaking in the same form from a similarly qualified person who
                        is acceptable to the College and ensure that it is delivered to the
                        College within that time.
                  
                  (g)   I, Dr. Fedoruk, undertake that if I am unable to obtain a Clinical
                        Supervisor on the provisions set out under sections (6)(e) and/or
                        (f) above, I will cease practising medicine until such time as I
                        have obtained a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College.
                  
                  (h)   I, Dr. Fedoruk, acknowledge that if I am required to cease practise
                        as a result of section (6)(g) above this will constitute a term,
                        condition or limitation on my certificate of registration and that
                        term, condition or limitation will be included on the public
                        register.
                  
            (7)   Professional Education

                  (a)   I, Dr. Fedoruk, undertake to participate in and successfully
                        complete all aspects of the detailed IEP, attached hereto as
                        Appendix "B", including all of the following professional education
                        (the "Professional Education"):
                  
                        (i)   Ontario Medical Association's online module: Billing for
                              Family Physicians
                  
                        (ii)  Review and a written summary of the following documents:
                  
                              1.    CPSO's The Practice Guide; and
                  
                              2.    Canadian Medical Association's Code of Ethics.
                  
                        (iii) PROBE: Ethics & Boundaries Program, by receiving a passing
                              evaluation or grade, without any condition or qualification.
                              I, Dr. Fedoruk, will agree to abide by any recommendations of
                              the PROBE program; and
                  
                        (iv)  any additional professional education recommended by my
                              Clinical Supervisor.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Fedoruk, undertake to provide proof to the College of my
                        successful completion of the Professional Education, including
                        proof of registration and attendance and participant assessment
                        reports, within one (1) month of completing it. I acknowledge that
                        the College will determine, in its sole discretion, whether I have
                        successfully completed the Professional Education.

                  (c)   I, Dr. Fedoruk, undertake to complete this requirement within three
                        (3) months or, if no satisfactory program is available by that
                        time, by the first possible opportunity thereafter.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Fedoruk, acknowledge that a report or reports may be
                        provided to the College regarding my progress and compliance with
                        the Professional Education.
                  
            (8)   Reassessment of Practice

                  (a)   I, Dr. Fedoruk, undertake that, approximately six (6) months after
                        the completion of the Clinical Supervision set out in section (6)
                        above and Appendix "A" to this Undertaking, and the completion of
                        the Professional Education set out in   section (7) above, I will
                        submit to a reassessment of my practice ("the Reassessment") by an
                        assessor or assessors selected by the College (the "Assessor" or
                        "Assessors"). I acknowledge that the Reassessment will include a
                        chart review of a minimum of fifteen (15) charts and related OHIP
                        billing information, and may include direct observation of my care,
                        interviews with me, colleagues and co-workers, feedback from
                        patients, and any other tools deemed necessary by the College.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Fedoruk, undertake to co-operate fully with the
                        Reassessment, conducted under the term of this Undertaking.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Fedoruk, acknowledge that my Clinical Supervisor may receive
                        and review the findings of the Assessor, and may discuss with the
                        Assessor any issues or concerns arising from the Reassessment.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Fedoruk, acknowledge that the results of the Reassessment
                        will be provided to me and reported to the College and the
                        Reassessment may form the basis of further action by the College.
                  
            (9)   Monitoring

                  (a)   I, Dr. Fedoruk, undertake to inform the College of each and every
                        location at which I practise or have privileges, including, but not
                        limited to, any hospitals, clinics, offices, and any Independent
                        Health Facilities with which I am affiliated, in any jurisdiction
                        (collectively my "Practice Location" or "Practice Locations"),
                        within five (5) days of executing this Undertaking. Going forward,
                        I further undertake to inform the College of any and all new
                        Practice Locations within five (5) days of commencing practice at
                        that location.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Fedoruk, undertake that I will submit to, and not interfere
                        with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Locations and patient
                        records by a College representative for the purposes of monitoring
                        my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Fedoruk, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                        appropriate enquiries of OHIP, NMS and/or any person who or
                        institution that may have relevant information, in order for the
                        College to monitor my compliance with the provisions of this
                        Undertaking.

                  (d)   I, Dr. Fedoruk, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP and NMS
                        consent forms, attached hereto as Appendix "C" and Appendix "D",
                        respectively.
                  
            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (10)  I, Dr. Fedoruk, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred
                  to in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (11)  I, Dr. Fedoruk, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely
                  responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc.
                  arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this
                  Undertaking.

            (12)  I, Dr. Fedoruk, acknowledge that I have read and understand the
                  provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal
                  counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my
                  right to do so.

            (13)  I, Dr. Fedoruk, acknowledge that the College will provide this
                  Undertaking to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar
                  responsibilities, at any Practice Location ("Chief of Staff" or "Chiefs
                  of Staff").

            (14)  I, Dr. Fedoruk, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this
                  Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
                  incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to
                  the Discipline Committee of the College.

            (15)  I, Dr. Fedoruk, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code.

            (16)  Public Register

                  (a)   I, Dr. Fedoruk, acknowledge that, during the time period that this
                        Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on
                        the Public Register.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Fedoruk, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking
                        being posted in accordance with section (16)(a) above, the
                        following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the
                        time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
                  
                              A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr.
                              Fedoruk engaged in professional misconduct or is incompetent
                              in his family medicine and chronic pain management practice,
                              including his billing to OHIP. As a result of the
                              investigation:
                  
                              Dr. Fedoruk will practise under the guidance of a Clinical
                              Supervisor acceptable to the College for 3 months.

                              Dr. Fedoruk will engage in professional education in ethics
                              and billing.
                  
                              Dr. Fedoruk's practice will be reassessed by an assessor
                              selected by the College within 6 months of the end of the
                              period of clinical supervision and education.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Fedoruk, acknowledge that this Undertaking remains in effect
                        until the College determines its terms are satisfied.
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (17)  I, Dr. Fedoruk, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide the
                  following information to any person who requires this information for the
                  purposes of facilitating my completion of the Professional Education and
                  to all Clinical Supervisors, and/or Assessors:

                  (a)   any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my
                        entering into this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment
                        of, my practice; and
                  
                  (c)   any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with
                        this Undertaking.
                  
            (18)  I, Dr. Fedoruk, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all
                  Chiefs of Staff with any information the College has that led to the
                  circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information
                  arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

            (19)  I, Dr. Fedoruk, give my irrevocable consent to any persons who facilitate
                  my completion of the Professional Education, and to all Clinical
                  Supervisors, Chiefs of Staff and Assessors, to disclose to the College,
                  and to one another, any of the following:

                  (a)   any information relevant to this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information relevant to the provisions of the Clinical
                        Supervisor's undertaking set out at Appendix "A" to this
                        Undertaking;
                  
                  (c)   any information relevant to the Reassessment;
                  
                  (d)   any information relevant for the purposes of monitoring my
                        compliance with this Undertaking; and/or
                  
                  (e)   any information which comes to their attention in the course of
                        providing the Professional Education and which they reasonably
                        believe indicates a potential risk of harm to my patients.

Concerns Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Source: Member
Active Date: March 5, 2020
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. James Curtis Fedoruk to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective March 5, 2020:

A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. Fedoruk engaged in professional misconduct or is incompetent in his family medicine and chronic pain management practice, including his billing to OHIP. As a result of the investigation:

Dr. Fedoruk will practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for 3 months.

Dr. Fedoruk will engage in professional education in ethics and billing.

Dr. Fedoruk’s practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected by the College within 6 months of the end of the period of clinical supervision and education.

 

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: February 5, 2020
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
Download Full Document (PDF)

 

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: August 2, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.
Download Full Document (PDF)