skip to content

Feakins, Martin John

CPSO#: 93110

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 08 Jun 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 08 Jun 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Dublin Trinity College, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
26 Dundas Street West
Napanee ON  K7R 1Z4
Phone: (613) 544-4900 Ext. 38100
Fax: (613) 540-6139 Electoral District: 06

Additional Practice Location(s)

Queen's University Postal Bag 603
Providence Care Hospital
752 King Street West
Kingston ON  K7L 4X3
Canada
Phone: (613) 5444900 Ext. 38100
Fax: (613) 540-6139
County: County of Frontenac
Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Feakins Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 08 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Feakins ( CPSO# 93110 )

Business Address:
Queen's University Postal Bag 603
Department of Psychiatry
Providence Care Mental Health
752 King Street West
Kingston ON  K7L 3N6
Phone Number: (613) 548-5567

Business Address:
26 Dundas Street
Napanee ON  K7R 1Z4
Phone Number: (613) 544-4900


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Providence Care Hospital Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:08 Jun 2010 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 08 Jun 2010
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 08 Jun 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Apr 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 23 Oct 2015
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 23 Oct 2015

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 23 Oct 2015 Active
             Dr. Martin John Feakins may practise medicine independently in Psychiatry.