skip to content

Fayez, Raad Mahmoud Mohammad

CPSO#: 89976

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 28 Feb 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 28 Feb 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Olivia Medical Centre
Al Andulus
Tahlia Street
Jeddah 25322
Saudi Arabia
Phone: +966 500300512

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Raad Fayez Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 14 2016

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Saudi Arabia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective:30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. RAAD MAHMOUD MOHAMMAD FAYEZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FAYEZ is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 20 Oct 2008 to 14 Dec 2008
EL - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Oct 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Dec 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Feb 2012