skip to content

Fausone, Gary Wilford

CPSO#: 85779

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 08 Feb 2007

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:06 Dec 2006 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 21 Nov 2006
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 21 Nov 2006
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 20 Oct 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 08 Feb 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Feb 2007
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2008