skip to content

Faulkner, John Jay

CPSO#: 32812

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 01 Oct 2001
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Oct 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1984 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1980
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 Jun 1981
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 1981
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 01 Oct 2001
The CPSO will be closed on Friday, April 19, 2019 for the statutory holiday. We will reopen at 8 a.m. on Monday, April 22.