skip to content

Fathi, Kate A

CPSO#: 96586

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 01 Jul 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:National University of Ireland, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Children's Hospital Eastern Ontario
CHEO
401 Smyth Rd
Department of Emergency Medicine
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 737-7600 Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist
Pediatric Emergency Medicine Effective:27 Sep 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. KATE A FATHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FATHI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Aug 2011 to 26 Aug 2011
EL - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Ottawa, 21 Nov 2011 to 16 Dec 2011
EL - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Ottawa, 02 Sep 2013 to 20 Sep 2013
EL - Paediatric Nephrology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jun 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
EL - Pediatric Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 26 Oct 2015 to 22 Nov 2015
EL - Pediatric Emergency Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
CF - Pediatric Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 26 Aug 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Nov 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 Dec 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Aug 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Sep 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Sep 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Sep 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Oct 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Nov 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016