Fatani, Tarah Hassan Hussain (CPSO#: 100127)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 02 Jun 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 02 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 31 May 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 10 Nov 2013 RCPSC Specialist
Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine Effective: 21 Sep 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 06 May 2013 to 02 Jun 2013
Elective Trainee - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 May 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 02 Jun 2013