skip to content

Fasola, Laurie Isabelle

CPSO#: 93851

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 07 Jan 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 07 Jan 2019

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:Universidad Central De Venezuela, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L2V7
Phone: 613 533-2660 Electoral District: 06

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cornwall Community Hospital Cornwall
Dryden Regional Health Centre Dryden
Lennox and Addington County General Hospital Napanee
Notre-Dame Hospital Hearst
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste. Marie
Sensenbrenner Hospital Kapuskasing

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective:30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. LAURIE ISABELLE FASOLA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FASOLA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 22 Sep 2010
AVP - General Surgery

University Of Toronto, 23 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 02 Jan 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University Of Toronto, 03 Jan 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Dec 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jan 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Dec 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jan 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Dec 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jan 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
CF - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2020 to 27 Jul 2020
CF - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jan 2019