Concerns
Source:
Other
Active Date: August 30, 2023
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Charges
Pervez Faruqi was charged with the following offences:
1. Assault, on or about August 16, 2023, contrary to section 266 of the Criminal Code of Canada.
2. Assault – Choking, Suffocating or Strangling, between January 1, 2023 and January 16, 2023, contrary to section 267(c) of the Criminal Code of Canada.
Date of Charge: August 30, 2023
Place of Charge: Chatham, Ontario
Chatham-Kent Police Service
Source:
Other
Active Date: August 22, 2023
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Bail Conditions
On August 22, 2023, the following Bail Conditions were imposed on Pervez Faruqi, and varied on November 1, 2023:
1. Dr. Faruqi must notify police of any change to his address.
2. Dr. Faruqi must not communicate, directly or indirectly, with named persons except through legal counsel with specified condition.
3. Dr. Faruqi must not go to a specified address with specified exception.