skip to content

Farsi, Sara Hasan M

CPSO#: 88692

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 10 Aug 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 27 Jan 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective:30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 16 Jun 2008 to 07 Sep 2008
PEAP - R - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 08 Sep 2008 to 07 Sep 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 08 Sep 2009 to 07 Sep 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 08 Sep 2010 to 07 Sep 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 08 Sep 2011 to 07 Sep 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 08 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Dec 2014
CF - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Sep 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jan 2015
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 10 Aug 2017