skip to content

Farrugia, Michael David Patrick

CPSO#: 94234

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 04 Mar 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 04 Mar 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:National University of Ireland, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
107 Victoria St E
Alliston
Ontario
L9R1G7
Alliston ON  L9R 1G7
Phone: (705) 434-5358
Fax: (705) 415-1190 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: MDP Farrugia Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 20 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Farrugia ( CPSO# 94234 )

Business Address:
Windsor Health Centre
Alliston Family Health Team
36 Victoria Street
P.O. Box 280
Alliston ON  L9R 1S8
Phone Number: (705) 435-8887

Business Address:
107 Victoria St E
Alliston ON  L9R 1G7


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Stevenson Memorial Hospital Alliston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:16 Dec 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MICHAEL DAVID PATRICK FARRUGIA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FARRUGIA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 29 Jul 2010 to 29 Sep 2010
EL - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 Sep 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 30 Mar 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 04 Mar 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Mar 2015