skip to content

Farrington, William Charles

CPSO#: 17941

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 02 Jul 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 28 Jun 1961

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1960

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Record Storage & Retrieval Services Inc. 111 St. Regis Crescent S. Toronto, Ontario M3J 1Y6 Tel: (416) 398-0638 Toll Free: 1-888-563-3732 Fax: (416) 398-5932 Website: www.rsrs.com
Date Received: 14 Jul 2009

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1961
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Jul 2009

Previous Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 09 Jan 2009
Summary:

 On January 9, 2009, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Farrington has committed an act of 
 professional misconduct in that he has been found guilty of an offence that is relevant to his 
 suitability to practise.  The Discipline Committee ordered Dr. Farrington to pay to the College 
 costs in the amount of $3,650.00 within 60 days of the date of this Order.  As well, the Committee 
 ordered the results of this proceeding to be included in the register.


Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): January 9, 2009