skip to content

Farooqui, Susanne

CPSO#: 90824

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 09 Jun 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 09 Jun 2009
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: Tracy, Susanne (used until: 01 Feb 2016 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:St. Matthew's University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Leamington District Memorial Hosp.
Department of General Surgery
194 Talbot Street West, 3rd Floor
Leamington ON  N8H 1N9
Phone: (519) 322-4933
Fax: (519) 322-1952 Electoral District: 01

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Susanne Farooqui Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 09 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Farooqui ( CPSO# 90824 )

Business Address:
Leamington District Memorial Hospital
Department of General Surgery
3rd Floor
194 Talbot Street West
Leamington ON  N8H 1N9
Phone Number: (519) 322-4933

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Erie Shores HealthCare Leamington

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 09 Jun 2009 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 09 Jun 2009
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 09 Jun 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 08 Dec 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Sep 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 03 Feb 2011
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 08 May 2011
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 19 Oct 2018

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
member Effective: 19 Oct 2018 Active
             (1 of 2)
            As  from  October  19,  2018, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate  of  registration held by Dr. Susanne Farooqui in
            accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Farooqui to the College
            of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                               UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
                                            ("Undertaking")
                                                  of
                                         DR. SUSANNE FAROOQUI
                                           ("Dr. Farooqui")
                                                  to 
                             COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                            (the "College")



                  PREAMBLE
                  
            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions  Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act,  1991,  S.O.  1991,  c.  18,  as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "ICR  Committee" means the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee of
                  the College;
                  
                  "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;
                  
                  "Public  Register"  means the College's register that is available to the
                  public.
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Farooqui, certificate of registration number 90824, am a member of
                  the College.  

            (3)   I, Dr. Farooqui, acknowledge  that the College conducted an investigation
                  bearing File Number 7215984 (the  "Investigation") into whether I engaged
                  in professional misconduct and/or am  incompetent  in  my general surgery
                  practice.

            (4)   I, Dr. Farooqui, have provided documentation to the College, confirming:

                  (a)   On  February  7,  2018,  I attended and successfully completed  the
                        Medical  Record-Keeping  Course   provided  by  the  University  of
                        Toronto, Faculty of Medicine;
                  
                  (b)   In  March  of  2018,  I reviewed the College  policies  on  Medical
                        Records and Consent to Treatment, and prepared a written summary of
                        the documents with reference  to  the current standards of practice
                        (where it is applicable), how it is  applicable to my situation, as
                        well as how I have or plan to make changes to my practice; and
                  
                  (c)   On  March  30,  2018,  I completed the following  Canadian  Medical
                        Protective  Association (CMPA)  eLearning  Modules:  Documentation:
                        Charting  Medical  Records  and  Documentation  II:  Principles  of
                        Medical Record Keeping.
                  
            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (5)   I,  Dr.  Farooqui,   undertake   to  abide  by  the  provisions  of  this
                  Undertaking, effective immediately.

            (6)   Reassessment of Practice

                  (a)   I, Dr. Farooqui, undertake that,  approximately  twelve (12) months
                        after the date of this Undertaking, I will submit to a reassessment
                        of  my  practice ("the Reassessment") by an assessor  or  assessors
                        selected  by  the  College  (the  "Assessor"  or  "Assessors").   I
                        acknowledge  that the Reassessment may include a chart review of 25
                        charts to include  endoscopy records (colonoscopy and gastroscopy -
                        UGI scope), open surgical  operative  notes,  consultation notes to
                        include  consent  discussion,  emergency  procedure   notes,  colon
                        resections,  and  appendectomies;  direct  observation of my  care;
                        interviews with colleagues and co-workers; feedback  from patients;
                        and any other tools deemed necessary by the College.
                  
                  (b)   I,   Dr.   Farooqui,   undertake   to  co-operate  fully  with  the
                        Reassessment, conducted under the term of this Undertaking. 
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Farooqui, acknowledge that the  results  of the Reassessment
                        will  be  provided  to  me  and  reported  to the College  and  the
                        Reassessment may form the basis of further action by the College. 
                  
            (7)   Monitoring 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Farooqui, undertake to inform the College  of each and every
                        location in which I practise or have privileges, including, but not
                        limited  to,  any hospitals, clinics, offices, and any  Independent
                        Health Facilities  with  which I am affiliated, in any jurisdiction
                        (collectively  my "Practice  Location"  or  "Practice  Locations"),
                        within five (5) days of executing this Undertaking.  Going forward,
                        I further undertake  to  inform  the  College  of  any  and all new
                        Practice  Locations within five (5) days of commencing practice  at
                        that location.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Farooqui, undertake that I will submit to, and not interfere
                        with, unannounced  inspections of my Practice Locations and patient
                        records by a College  representative for the purposes of monitoring
                        my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Farooqui, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                        appropriate enquiries of  OHIP and/or any person who or institution
                        that may have relevant information,  in  order  for  the College to
                        monitor my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking. 
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Farooqui, acknowledge that I have executed the  OHIP consent
                        form, attached hereto as Appendix "A". 
                  
            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (8)   I, Dr. Farooqui, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or  referred
                  to in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (9)   I,  Dr.  Farooqui,  acknowledge  and  undertake  that  I  shall be solely
                  responsible  for  payment  of  all  fees, costs, charges, expenses,  etc.
                  arising  from  the  implementation  of any  of  the  provisions  of  this
                  Undertaking. 

            (10)  I,  Dr.  Farooqui,  acknowledge  that  I have  read  and  understand  the
                  provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal
                  counsel in reviewing and executing this  Undertaking,  or  have waived my
                  right to do so.

            (11)  I,   Dr.  Farooqui,  acknowledge  that  the  College  will  provide  this
                  Undertaking   to  any  Chief  of  Staff,  or  a  colleague  with  similar
                  responsibilities,  at  any Practice Location ("Chief of Staff" or "Chiefs
                  of Staff").

            (12)  I, Dr. Farooqui, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this
                  Undertaking may constitute  an  act  of  professional  misconduct  and/or
                  incompetence,  and  may result in a referral of specified allegations  to
                  the Discipline Committee of the College.

            (13)  I, Dr. Farooqui, acknowledge  that  this  Undertaking  constitutes terms,
                  conditions,  and  limitations on my certificate of registration  for  the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code. 

            (14)  Public Register

                  (a)   I, Dr. Farooqui, acknowledge that, during the time period that this
                        Undertaking remains  in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on
                        the Public Register.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Farooqui, acknowledge  that, in addition to this Undertaking
                        being  posted  in  accordance  with   section  (14)(a)  above,  the
                        following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the
                        time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
                  
                        A  College investigation was conducted into  whether  Dr.  Farooqui
                        engaged  in  professional  misconduct  and/or is incompetent in her
                        general surgery practice. As a result of the investigation:
                  
                        Dr. Farooqui's practice will be reassessed  by an assessor selected
                        by the College within approximately 12 months.
                  
                  (c)   I,  Dr.  Farooqui,  acknowledge  that this Undertaking  remains  in
                        effect until the College determines its terms are satisfied.
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (15)  I, Dr. Farooqui, give my irrevocable consent  to  the  College to provide
                  the following information to any person who requires this information for
                  the purposes of facilitating my reassessment, and/or the Assessor(s):

                  (a)   any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my
                        entering into this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information arising from any investigation into,  or assessment
                        of, my practice; and 
                  
                  (c)   any  information arising from the monitoring of my compliance  with
                        this Undertaking.
                  
            (16)  I, Dr. Farooqui,  give  my  irrevocable consent to the College to provide
                  all Chiefs of Staff with any  information the College has that led to the
                  circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information
                  arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

            (17)  I,  Dr.  Farooqui,  give  my  irrevocable  consent  to  any  persons  who
                  facilitate  my  completion of my  reassessment,  Chief(s)  of  Staff  and
                  Assessor(s), to disclose  to  the College, and to one another, any of the
                  following:

                  (a)   any information relevant to this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information relevant to the Reassessment;
                  
                  (c)   any  information  relevant   for  the  purposes  of  monitoring  my
                        compliance with this Undertaking; and/or  
                  
                  (d)   any information which comes to  their attention in the course of my
                        completion of the reassessment and  which  they  reasonably believe
                        indicates a potential risk of harm to my patients.
                  
                  
            (2 of 2)

            Dr.  Susanne  Farooqui may practice medicine independently in general  surgery,
            only.