skip to content

Farooqi, Abdul Zahir Sayeed

CPSO#: 86007

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 07 Mar 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 07 Mar 2007

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Urdu

Education:University of Karachi, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UNIT A01
6405 ERIN MILLS PARKWAY
Mississauga ON  L5N 4H4
Phone: 905-582-0232
Fax: 905-582-3846 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

Grand River Hospital
835 King Street
Kitchener ON  N2G 2M7
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03

2165 Grosvenor st
Oakville ON  L6H 7K9
Canada
Phone: 905 582 0232
Fax: 905 582 3846
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04

1360 Weber st east
Kitchener ,ON
N2A 1C4
Kitchener ON  N2A 1C4
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03

10 GILLINGHAM DRIVE
Brampton ON  L6X 5A5
Canada
Phone: 905 5809851
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

347 ERB ST. W. UNIT 6
Waterloo ON  N2L 1W4
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03

111-47 QUEEN ST E
Brampton ON  L6W 0B8
Canada
Phone: (905) 582-0232
Fax: (905) 582-3846
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

609 FORD DRIVE
UNIT #7
OAKVILLE ON  L6J 7Z6
CANADA
CANADA
Phone: 905-582-0232
Fax: 905-582-3846
County: 
Electoral District: 

475 KING STREET NORTH
WATERLOO ON  N2J 2Z5
CANADA
CANADA
Phone: 905-582-0232
Fax: 905-582-3846
County: 
Electoral District: 

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. A. Farooqi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 30 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Farooqi ( CPSO# 86007 )

Business Address:
A-01 - 6405 Erin Mills Parkway
Mississauga ON  L5N 4H4
Phone Number: (905) 582-0232

Business Address:
1360 Weber Street
Kitchener ON  N2A 1C4

Business Address:
835 King Street West
Kitchener ON  N2G 2M7

Business Address:
3 - 2165 Grovesnor Street
Oakville ON  L6H 7K9
Phone Number: (905) 582-0232

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:07 Mar 2007 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 07 Mar 2007
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 07 Mar 2007
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 06 Sep 2008
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jul 2008
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 14 Aug 2008

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jul 2008 Active
             Dr.  Abdul  Zahir Sayeed Farooqi may practise independently only in the area of
            Psychiatry.