skip to content

Farooq, Muryum

CPSO#: 87065

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglington Ave West
Mississauga
Toronto ON  L4M 6M2
Phone: 9058132200 Ext. 3946
Fax: 416-242-1069 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

Humber River Hospital
1235 Wilson Ave
Toronto
M3MOB2
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Canada
Phone: 416 242 1000 Ext. 4800
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Muryum Farooq Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 28 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Farooq ( CPSO# 87065 )

Business Address:
Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone Number: (905) 813-2200

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective:04 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MURYUM FAROOQ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FAROOQ is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jun 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 20 Sep 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 21 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2013