skip to content

Farooq, Bushra

CPSO#: 87466

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 22 Jan 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 22 Jan 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:Punjab University, Pakistan, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
475 charolais blvd
Brampton ON  L6Y 0M2
Phone: (905) 454-3347
Fax: (905) 454-3288 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

7070 Saint barbara blvd
Mississauga ON  L5W 0E6
Canada
Phone: (905) 565-9100
Fax: (905) 565-8973
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Bushra Farooq Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 19 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Farooq ( CPSO# 87466 )

Business Address:
475 Charolais Boulevard
Brampton ON  L6Y 0M2
Phone Number: (905) 454-3347

Business Address:
7070 Saint Barbara Boulevard
Mississauga ON  L5W 0E6
Phone Number: (905) 565-9100

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 10 Dec 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. BUSHRA FAROOQ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FAROOQ is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2007
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Aug 2007
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Sep 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 22 Jan 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jan 2009