skip to content

Khan, Farooq Ali

CPSO#: 104204

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 30 Jun 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2014
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto General Hospital
Division of Emergency Medicine
R F E G S 480
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-3856 Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. FAROOQ ALI KHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHAN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014

Previous Hearings Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 12 Apr 2018
Summary:

On April 10, 2018, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Farooq Ali Khan committed an act 
of professional misconduct, in that he has been found guilty of an offence that is relevant to his 
suitability to practice.  
 
Dr. Khan is an emergency physician who practises at the Hospital in Toronto. He received 
his certificate of independent practice from the College in June 2014. 
 
Criminal Finding  
 
On August 13, 2015, Dr. Khan pled guilty to and was found guilty of sexual assault 
under s. 271(b) the Criminal Code. Dr. Khan was granted an absolute discharge on the 
basis of a joint submission on penalty.    
 
Facts Underlying Criminal Finding  
 
In August 2009, Dr. Khan slept over at the house of AB. At the time, Dr. Khan was in his 
mid-twenties, having recently graduated from medical school and started his residency 
program, and AB was a teenager. Dr. Khan and AB were sleeping in bunk beds in the 
same room. Dr. Khan was on the top bunk and AB was on the lower bunk. During the 
night, Dr. Khan climbed down and fondled AB’s penis while he believed that AB was 
sleeping. Dr. Khan masturbated while fondling AB. At one point, AB moved, and Dr. 
Khan stopped for a few minutes. When AB was still again and Dr. Khan believed him to be 
still asleep, he started fondling him again, while masturbating. When AB made a noise, Dr. 
Khan withdrew his hand and went back to the top bunk. Shortly after that, AB got up, ran out 
of the room, and told his parents what had happened. 
 
Disposition 
 
On April 12, 2018, the Committee reserved its decision on penalty and costs.

Hearing Date(s): Hearing: April 9-12, 2018 and July 20, 2018 Penalty Hearing: August 20, 2019