skip to content

Khan, Farooq Ali

CPSO#: 104204

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 30 Jun 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. FAROOQ ALI KHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHAN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014

Previous Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 12 Apr 2018
Summary:

On April 10, 2018, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Farooq Ali Khan committed 
 an act of professional misconduct, in that he has been found guilty of an offence that 
 is relevant to his suitability to practice.  
  
 Dr. Khan is an emergency physician who practises at the Hospital in Toronto. He 
 received his certificate of independent practice from the College in June 2014. 
  
 Criminal Finding  
  
 On August 13, 2015, Dr. Khan pled guilty to and was found guilty of sexual 
assault under s. 271(b) the Criminal Code. Dr. Khan was granted an absolute 
 discharge on the basis of a joint submission on penalty.    
 
Facts Underlying Criminal Finding  
 
 In August 2009, Dr. Khan slept over at the house of AB. At the time, Dr. Khan was 
 in his mid-twenties, having recently graduated from medical school and started his 
 residency program, and AB was a teenager. Dr. Khan and AB were sleeping in bunk 
 beds in the same room. Dr. Khan was on the top bunk and AB was on the lower 
 bunk. During the night, Dr. Khan climbed down and fondled AB’s penis while he 
 believed that AB was sleeping. Dr. Khan masturbated while fondling AB. At one 
 point, AB moved, and Dr. Khan stopped for a few minutes. When AB was still again 
 and Dr. Khan believed him to be still asleep, he started fondling him again, while 
 masturbating. When AB made a noise, Dr. Khan withdrew his hand and went back to 
 the top bunk. Shortly after that, AB got up, ran out of the room, and told his parents 
 what had happened. 
  
 On April 12, 2018, the Committee reserved its decision on penalty and costs. 
  
 Further Procedural History 
  
 The hearing resumed on July 20, 2018, at which time the Committee further reserved 
 its decision on penalty to consider the issue of retrospectivity of Ontario Regulation 
 262/18 (“O. Reg. 262/18”) which had come into force on May 1, 2018.  
  
 In July 2019, the Divisional Court released its decision in Ontario (College of Physicians 
 and Surgeons of Ontario) v. Kunynetz, 2019 ONSC 4300, holding that the amendments 
 to the RHPA made under the Protecting Patients Act should not be treated as 
 retrospective.   
  
 On August 20, 2019, the Committee held a further penalty hearing at which time the 
 parties presented a joint submission on penalty and costs to the Committee. The 
 Committee reserved decision. 
  
 On May 29, 2020, the Committee released its penalty decision in which it ordered and 
 directed on the matter of penalty and costs that there shall be no penalty imposed on 
 Dr. Khan in this matter, and no order that he pay costs to the College.   
  
 On June 24, 2020 the College received notification of the College’s appeal from the Discipline 
Committee’s Order to the Divisional Court.


Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Hearing Date(s): April 9-12, 2018 and July 20, 2018