skip to content

Farno, Ali

CPSO#: 85232

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi

Education: Tehran University of Medical Sciences Sc, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Ali Farno Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 24 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Farno ( CPSO# 85232 )

Business Address:
Suite 407
250 Harding Boulevard West
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 9M7
Phone Number: (647) 848-1848


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Yukon

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill
Scarborough Health Network Centenary Toronto
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount Toronto
Scarborough Hospital General Toronto
Stevenson Memorial Hospital Alliston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective:30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ALI FARNO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FARNO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 22 Sep 2006
AVP - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2011