skip to content

Farkhani, Nima

CPSO#: 89147

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi

Education:SHAHEED BEHESHTI UNIVERSITY, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Dr. Nima Farkhani MPC
11 Brunel CRT., Suite: 1511
Toronto ON  M5V 3Y3
Phone: (416) 893-4920 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Nima Farkhani Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 15 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Farkhani ( CPSO# 89147 )

Business Address:
Gph35-1 Edgewater Dr
Toronto ON  M5A 0L1
Phone Number: 4168934920

Business Address:
1235 Wilson Avenue
Emergency Room
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Phone Number: (416) 242-1000

Business Address:
11 Brunel Court
Suite 1511
Toronto ON  M5V 3Y3

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
C723 - 2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-4037

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. NIMA FARKHANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FARKHANI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 22 Sep 2008
AVP - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2013