skip to content

Farkashidy, Joseph

CPSO#: 17199

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 31 Jan 1997
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 31 Jan 1997

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Date of Death: 8-Aug-2001

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, German, Hungarian

Education:Peter Pazmany University of Budapest, 1938

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective:30 Nov 1960 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1957
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1959
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jul 1959
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 26 Oct 1989
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 26 Oct 1989
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 Jan 1997