skip to content

Farhat, Gloria Gerges

CPSO#: 89977

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 17 Jan 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 17 Jan 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:American University of the Caribbean, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 17
1525 Cornwall Road
Oakville ON  L6J 0B2
Phone: (289) 291-0220
Fax: (289) 291-0222 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: GG Farhat Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 01 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Farhat ( CPSO# 89977 )

Business Address:
Suite 17
1525 Cornwall Road
Oakville ON  L6J 0B2
Phone Number: (289) 291-0220

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:16 Dec 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. GLORIA GERGES FARHAT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FARHAT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Nov 2008 to 23 Jan 2009
AVP - Family Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 24 Jan 2009 to 31 Oct 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Nov 2009 to 31 Oct 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jan 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Oct 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jan 2011