skip to content

Farhan, Joman Ishaq

CPSO#: 88307

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 20 Aug 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 03 Jun 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Jordan, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: J. Farhan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 6 2012

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 22 May 2008
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 22 May 2008
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 21 May 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 21 May 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 03 Jun 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 20 Aug 2011