skip to content

Farcas, Monica A

CPSO#: 93146

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Michaels Hospital
61 Queen St. East
Suite 2-012
Toronto ON  M5C 2T2
Phone: 416-867-3735
Fax: 416-867-7433 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: M. Farcas Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 09 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Farcas ( CPSO# 93146 )

Business Address:
61 Queen Street East
Room 2-012
Toronto ON  M5C 2T2
Phone Number: (416) 867-3735

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MONICA A FARCAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FARCAS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015