skip to content

Farago III, Peter Joseph

CPSO#: 96622

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 17 May 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 17 May 2012
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:American University of the Caribbean, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1883 Turner Road
Windsor ON  N8W 3K2
Phone: 2269461000
Fax: 5192534713 Electoral District: 01

Additional Practice Location(s)

433 Sandwich Street South
Amherstburg ON  N9V 3K8
Canada
Phone: 2269461000
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01

6525 Malden Road
Windsor ON  N9H 1T5
Canada
Phone: 2269461000
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01

1083 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor ON  N9A 4J8
Canada
Phone: 2269461000
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Peter Farago III Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 18 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Blue ( CPSO# 94354 )
Dr. P. Farago III ( CPSO# 96622 )

Business Address:
3019 Tecumseh Road East
Windsor ON  N8W 1G8
Phone Number: (519) 258-4773

Business Address:
380 Pelissier Street
Windsor ON  N9A 6W8
Phone Number: (519) 962-0749

Business Address:
6525 Malden Road
Windsor ON  N9H 1T5
Phone Number: (519) 258-4773

Business Address:
433 Sandwich South
Amherstburg ON  N9V 3K8
Phone Number: (519) 258-4773


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - Michigan

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 22 Jul 2011
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 22 Jul 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 20 Jul 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 15 Dec 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 17 May 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 17 May 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 06 Nov 2013
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 06 Nov 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 27 Oct 2014

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 27 Oct 2014 Active
             Dr.  Peter  Joseph  Farago III may practise independently in addiction medicine
            and family medicine, only.