skip to content

Farag, George Abdalla Reyad

CPSO#: 86741

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Tanta University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Cardio Care
Heart institute
Lower level
481London Road
Sarnia ON  N7T 4X3
Phone: (519) 541-0030
Fax: (519) 339-0993 Electoral District: 01

Additional Practice Location(s)

Windsor Regional Hospital
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor ON  N9A 1E1
Canada
Phone: (416) 586-8472
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01

89 Norman st. Sarnia
Sarnia ON  N7T6S3
Canada
Phone: 5194644400
County: County of Lambton
Electoral District: 01

London cardiac institute
1055 FANSHAWE PARK RD W
London ON  N6G 0W7
Canada
Phone: (519) 645-0146
Fax: (519) 645-1584
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: GA Farag Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 15 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Farag ( CPSO# 86741 )

Business Address:
1995 Lens Avenue
London ON  N8W 1L9
Phone Number: (519) 245-5577

Business Address:
481 London Road
Lower Level
Sarnia ON  N7T 4X3
Phone Number: (519) 491-9990

Business Address:
201-1055 Fanshawe Park Road
London ON  N6A 5P6
Phone Number: (519) 645-0146

Business Address:
89 Norman Street
Sarnia ON  N7T 6S3
Phone Number: (519) 464-4400


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Egypt

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bluewater Health Sarnia
Hotel Dieu Grace Healthcare,Tayfour Campus Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective:02 Oct 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. GEORGE ABDALLA REYAD FARAG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FARAG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 23 Sep 2007
AVP - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 24 Sep 2007 to 29 Feb 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Mar 2008 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Apr 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 May 2009 to 30 Apr 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 May 2010 to 30 Apr 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 May 2011 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

Western University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

Western University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Cardiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2012