skip to content

Farag, Ashraf Mohamed Dakhil

CPSO#: 88110

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 24 Apr 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 24 Apr 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Al Fateh, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Windsor Regional Hospital
1030 Ouellette Ave
Windsor ON  N9A 1E1
Phone: 5192545577 Electoral District: 01

Additional Practice Location(s)

Windsor cardiac centre
130 Ouellette Ave
Windsor ON  N8X 1L9
Canada
Phone: 15192504449
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Ashraf Farag Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 16 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Farag ( CPSO# 88110 )

Business Address:
Windsor Regional Hospital
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor ON  N9A 1E1
Phone Number: (519) 254-5577

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste. Marie
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective:10 Oct 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ASHRAF MOHAMED DAKHIL FARAG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FARAG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 06 Mar 2008 to 02 Apr 2008
EL - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Mar 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 02 Apr 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Apr 2012