skip to content

Fantus, Claire

CPSO#: 93721

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 09 Sep 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 09 Sep 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Ben Gurion University of the Negev, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Peterborough Regional Health Centre
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Phone: (705) 743-2121 Ext. 5028 Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Claire Fantus Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 27 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Fantus ( CPSO# 93721 )

Business Address:
Peterborough Regional Health Centre
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Phone Number: (705) 743-2121

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. CLAIRE FANTUS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FANTUS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 22 Sep 2010
Assessment Verification Period - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 02 Oct 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 02 Oct 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Sep 2015