skip to content

Fantham-Tremblay, Neva Virginia

CPSO#: 93548

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 16 Dec 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: Fantham, Neva Virginia (used until: 15 Dec 2015 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1221 Algonquin Avenue
North Bay ON  P1B 4Y3
Phone: (705) 478-7300
Fax: (705) 478-8884 Electoral District: 08

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Neva Fantham-Tremblay Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 10 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Fantham-Tremblay ( CPSO# 93548 )

Business Address:
203 - 1221 Algonquin Avenue
North Bay ON  P1B 4Y3
Phone Number: (705) 478-7300

Business Address:
50 College Drive
North Bay ON  P1B 5A4
Phone Number: (705) 474-8600

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective:16 Dec 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. NEVA VIRGINIA FANTHAM-TREMBLAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FANTHAM-TREMBLAY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 16 Dec 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 17 Dec 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 16 Dec 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 17 Dec 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 16 Dec 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Dec 2015