skip to content

Fanous, Victor Guirguis Nashed

CPSO#: 90335

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 24 Jun 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 05 Dec 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Ain Shams University Faculty of Medicine, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 08 Apr 2009 to 22 Jun 2009
PEAP - R - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

McMaster University, 23 Jun 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 08 Apr 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 05 Dec 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 24 Jun 2013