skip to content

Fan, Michael Kuen-Dan

CPSO#: 29122

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 27 Jul 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 27 Jul 2019

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:University of Toronto, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. M. Fan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 16 2019

Medical Records Location

Address: Medical records are stored at: Docudavit Solutions 28 Eugene St North York ON M6B 3Z4 Tel: 1-888-781-9083
Date Received: 12 Sep 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1976
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1977
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 27 Jul 2019