skip to content

Fan, Lily Zhuoqi

CPSO#: 96290

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Mandarin

Education:Western University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Catherines General Hospital
Dept of Diagnostic Imaging
1200 Fourth Ave
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Phone: (905) 684-7271 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: L. Fan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 27 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Fan ( CPSO# 96290 )

Business Address:
St Catharines General Hospital
Dept of Diagnostic Imaging
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Phone Number: (905) 684-7271

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective:31 Jul 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. LILY ZHUOQI FAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 Jul 2011
EL - Diagnostic Radiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Aug 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2012