skip to content

Fam, David Jonathan

CPSO#: 97648

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Academy of Medicine, Lodz, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Joseph's Health Centre
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone: (416) 530-6119
Fax: 416 530 6360 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: David J. Fam Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 02 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Fam ( CPSO# 97648 )

Business Address:
235 Wallace Avenue
Toronto ON  M6H 1V5
Phone Number: (416) 703-3525

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Health Centre
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone Number: (416) 530-6119

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective:30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. DAVID JONATHAN FAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FAM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 22 Sep 2012
AVP - Neurology

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
CF - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2017