Faluyi, Olusola Olusesan (CPSO#: 96789)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Sep 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Sep 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Obafemi Awolowo University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 08 Sep 2011 to 30 Nov 2011
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Dec 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Sep 2012
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 09 Sep 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Dec 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 2012