First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 09 Jun 1975 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1977 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 05 Sep 1978 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 13 Oct 1978 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1979 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1980 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 10 Feb 1981 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 08 Mar 1982 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 18 Apr 1983 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 29 Apr 1983 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 09 Sep 1983 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 09 Sep 1983 |