skip to content

Fallen, Robyn Shaughnessy

CPSO#: 97581

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Grand River Hospital
Freeport Site
Specialized Mental Health
3570 King Street East
Kitchener ON  N2A 2W1
Phone: (519) 749-4300 Ext. 7009
Fax: (519) 894-8308 Electoral District: 03

Additional Practice Location(s)

St. John's Kitchen Outreach Clinic
97A Victoria Street North
Kitchener ON  N2H 5C1
Canada
Phone: (519) 342-1616
Fax: (519) 513-9777
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: RS Fallen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 27 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Fallen ( CPSO# 97581 )

Business Address:
Grand River Hospital
Freeport Site
3570 King Street East
PO Box 9056
Kitchener ON  N2A 2W1
Phone Number: (519) 749-4300

Business Address:
St Johns Kitchen Outreach Clinic
97A Victoria Street North
Kitchener ON  N2H 5C1
Phone Number: (519) 342-1616

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Freeport Site Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ROBYN SHAUGHNESSY FALLEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FALLEN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2017