skip to content

Fallen, Ernest Leo

CPSO#: 18464

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1961

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 01 Jan 1968 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Aug 1962
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 03 Jan 1964
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Aug 1964
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 03 May 1965
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jun 1975
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2012