skip to content

Fallah-Rad, Nazanin

CPSO#: 93613

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 05 Apr 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Princess Margaret Cancer Centre UHN
610 University Ave
700U Rm 716
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone: (416) 946-4501 Ext. 7522
Fax: (416) 946-6546 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Fallah-Rad Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 08 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Fallah-Rad ( CPSO# 93613 )

Business Address:
Princess Margaret Cancer Centre - UHN
610 University Avenue
OPG - 7-716
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone Number: (416) 946-4501

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario,Cancer Institu Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective:27 Sep 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. NAZANIN FALLAH-RAD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FALLAH-RAD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Oncology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Medical Oncology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
CF - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Apr 2016