skip to content

Falconer, Erin Florence Eleanor

CPSO#: 98006

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
240 Pinnacle St
Belleville ON  K8N 3A6
Phone: 613 968 9840
Fax: 613 968 5495 Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Erin Falconer Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 06 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Falconer ( CPSO# 98006 )

Business Address:
265 Dundas Street East
Belleville ON  K8N 5A9
Phone Number: (613) 969-7400

Business Address:
242 King Street
Trenton ON  K8V 5S6
Phone Number: (613) 392-2540

Business Address:
240 Pinnacle Street
Belleville ON  K8P 3A6
Phone Number: (613) 968-9840


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Nunavut

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Quinte Healthcare,Belleville General Site Belleville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:23 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ERIN FLORENCE ELEANOR FALCONER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FALCONER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 15 Feb 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2014