skip to content

Fakour, Flor

CPSO#: 98429

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 22 Jul 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Persian

Education: Tehran University of Medical Sciences, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 7
750 Big Bay point Road
Barrie ON  L4M 4S6
Phone: 705 503 5454
Fax: 705 503 5453 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Flor Fakour Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 30 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Fakour ( CPSO# 98429 )

Business Address:
7-750 Big Bay Point Road
Barrie ON  L4M 4S6
Phone Number: (705) 503-5454


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Iran

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:21 Jul 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. FLOR FAKOUR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FAKOUR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 22 Sep 2012
AVP - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 23 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 28 Jul 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jul 2014