skip to content

Fakim, Abid

CPSO#: 27798

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 09 Aug 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 09 Aug 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Irish Conjoint Board, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Abid Fakim Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Feb 16 2016

Medical Records Location

Instructions: All medical records for Dr. Fakim's patients have been transferred to Dr. Shreyas Rana. Patients may contact Dr. Rana's office to complete a request form for Docudavit Solutions.The office address and contact information is as follows: Suite 1 A 595 Ontario Road Welland ON L3B 0B3 Phone: 905-735-5627 Fax: 905-735-5628
Date Received: 24 Jul 2015


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Mauritius

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1973
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1974
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 08 Sep 1975
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Sep 1975
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 09 Aug 2016