skip to content

Faisal, Shazia

CPSO#: 88895

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 18 Jan 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 18 Jan 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Urdu

Education:King Edward Medical College, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 124
2462 Howard Avenue
Windsor ON  N8X 3V6
Phone: (519) 946-0727
Fax: (519) 946-1253 Electoral District: 01

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Shazia Faisal Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 25 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Faisal ( CPSO# 88895 )

Business Address:
Suite 124
2462 Howard Avenue
Windsor ON  N8X 3V6
Phone Number: (519) 946-0727

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Dec 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SHAZIA FAISAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FAISAL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 23 Sep 2008
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 24 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 16 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 18 Jan 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jan 2011