skip to content

Fairgrieve, Christopher Douglas

CPSO#: 94026

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 07 Jun 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 07 Jun 2019

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Western University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
692 Euclid Ave
Toronto ON  M6G 2T9
Fax: 1-855-437-1609 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

Mental Health and Addiction Service
17th Floor Cardinal Carter Wing
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Canada
Phone: 416-864-3082
Fax: 416-864-5480
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Christopher Douglas Fairgrieve Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 29 2019

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Fairgrieve ( CPSO# 94026 )

Business Address:
3rd Floor
100 Stokes Street
Toronto ON  M6J 1H4
Phone Number: (416) 274-3562

Medical Records Location

Address: Unit 2201 1150 Jervis Street Vancouver, BC V6E 2C8
Date Received: 22 May 2015

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:24 Jan 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER DOUGLAS FAIRGRIEVE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FAIRGRIEVE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Sep 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Oct 2011 to 30 Sep 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Oct 2012 to 31 Jan 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University Of Toronto, 29 Feb 2016 to 11 Mar 2016
EL - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jan 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 May 2013
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Feb 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Mar 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jun 2019