skip to content

Fairfull Smith, Robert John

CPSO#: 27986

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 18 Dec 1975

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Glasgow School of Medicine, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Robert Fairfull-Smith Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 20 2015

Medical Records Location

Address: 488 Carlingview, Toronto, ON M9W 6M8
Instructions: Ottawa Hospital & File Bank
Date Received: 27 May 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective:13 Mar 1978 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Dec 1975
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2015