skip to content

Ghaly, Fady Rizk Masoud

CPSO#: 105628

MEMBER STATUS
Suspended as of 08 Jul 2021
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 23 Jun 2021

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Ain Shams University Faculty of Medicine, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Fady Ghaly Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 08 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Ghaly ( CPSO# 105628)

Business Address:
2 - 925 Dundas Street
Woodstock ON  N4S 8V3
Phone Number: (519) 537-2992

Business Address:
Suite 4
403 Arkell Road
Guelph ON  N1L 1E5
Phone Number: (519) 265-1310

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Apr 2015
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2021
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Discipline Committee Effective: 23 Jun 2021
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 08 Jul 2021

Previous Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 10 Feb 2021
Summary:

On February 8-10, 2021, the Discipline Committee of the College heard, via 
videoconference, an allegation of Dr. Ghaly’s professional misconduct. The hearing 
proceeded in the presence of Dr. Ghaly and his counsel, and counsel for the College. 
 
Dr. Ghaly used a cellphone to surreptitiously record video of two clinic employees, 
without their knowledge or consent, when they were using the staff washroom. In a 
subsequent criminal trial, Dr. Ghaly pleaded guilty to the offence of mischief. 
In the Discipline proceedings, Dr. Ghaly admitted the facts and that they constituted 
professional misconduct. The Committee found that Dr. Ghaly committed an act of 
professional misconduct, in that he: 

         a. engaged in an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, 
            having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by 
            members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional (under 
            paragraph 1(1)33 of Ontario Regulation 856/93); and 

         b. has been found guilty of an offence that is relevant to his suitability to 
            practise (under clause 51(1)(a) of the Health Professions Procedural Code 
            which is Schedule 2 to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 
            1991, c.18). 
Disposition 
The parties disagreed as to what the penalty should be and, at the conclusion of the 
hearing, the Committee reserved decision. In its order and reasons released on June 23, 
2021, the Committee directed and ordered, with respect to penalty, that: 

   •  Dr. Ghaly attend before the Committee to be reprimanded; 
   •  The Registrar suspend Dr. Ghaly’s certificate of registration for a period of 14 
      months, commencing at 12.01 a.m. on July 8, 2021; 
   •  The Registrar place terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. Ghaly’s certificate of 
      registration;  
   •  Dr. Ghaly to inform the College of a change in his treating therapists 
   •  Dr. Ghaly to inform the College of all his practice locations 
   •  Costs to be agreed, or if not, to be determined by the Committee.


Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Hearing Date(s): February 8-10, 2021

Concerns

Source: Other
Active Date: March 8, 2019
Expiry Date:
Summary:
FINDINGS OF GUILT
Fady Ghaly was found guilty of the following offence:

1. Mischief by obstructing, interrupting or interfering with property, contrary to Section 430(1)(c) of the Criminal Code of Canada.

DATE: October 29, 2018
SENTENCE: Conditional sentence: 6 months’ imprisonment to be served in the community (see PDF for terms), followed by 18 months’ probation; Victim surcharge of $200.
Download Full Document (PDF)