skip to content

Fadeel, Khalid Saleh

CPSO#: 88136

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 04 Mar 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 15 Jul 2021

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education: University of Tripoli Faculty of Medicin, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
501-520 Ellesmere Rd
Malvern Medical Center
Scarborough ON  M1R 0B1
Phone: 4162917719
Fax: 416-287-3775 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

LAKERIDGE HEALTH
580 Hrwood south
Ajax ON  L1S2J4
Canada
Phone: 9056832320 Ext. 3247
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

SCARBOROUGH HEALTH NET WORK
2867 Ellesmere Rd
Scarborough ON  M1E 4B9
Canada
Phone: 4162817387
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Khalid Fadeel Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 10 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Fadeel ( CPSO# 88136 )

Business Address:
Malvern Medical Center
Suite 100
1333 Neilson Road
Scarborough ON  M1B 4Y9
Phone Number: (647) 226-1636

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax
Scarborough Health Network Centenary Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:06 Dec 2007 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. KHALID SALEH FADEEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FADEEL is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Mar 2008
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 03 Feb 2020
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 03 Feb 2020
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 2021

Concerns

Source: Compliance and Monitoring Department
Active Date: July 29, 2015
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.
Download Full Document (PDF)